MN HF600 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 32-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate conferees Miller, Rosen, Sparks
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate conferees Miller, Rosen, Sparks
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform State Labor Standards Act enacted, and uniformity for employment mandates on private employers provided.
Title
Uniform State Labor Standards Act enacted, and uniformity for employment mandates on private employers provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Garofalo [R] | Sen. Jeff Howe [R] | Rep. Joyce Peppin [R] | Rep. Gene Pelowski [D] |
Rep. Paul Marquart [D] | Rep. Marion O'Neill [R] | Rep. Kelly Fenton [R] | Rep. Kurt Daudt [R] |
Rep. Dan Fabian [R] | Rep. Jon Koznick [R] | Rep. Dennis Smith [R] | Rep. Jim Newberger [R] |
Rep. Paul H. Anderson [R] | Rep. Bob Loonan [R] | Rep. Brian Daniels [R] | Rep. Jeanne Poppe [D] |
Rep. Cindy Pugh [R] | Rep. Peggy Scott [R] | Rep. Nolan West [R] | Sen. Jason Rarick [R] |
Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Tim O'Driscoll [R] | Rep. Jim Nash [R] | Rep. Tony Albright [R] |
Rep. Chris Swedzinski [R] | Rep. Linda Runbeck [R] | Rep. Mark Uglem [R] | Rep. Jerry Hertaus [R] |
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Sondra Erickson [R] | Rep. Joe McDonald [R] | Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] |
Rep. Barb Haley [R] | Rep. Kathy Lohmer [R] | Rep. Jeff Backer [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House: Passage (Y: 76 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House: Passage (Y: 76 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Senate conferees Miller, Rosen, Sparks |
2018-02-22 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate conferees Miller; Rosen; Sparks |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | House conferees Garofalo; Baker; Poppe |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Bill returned to conference committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Taken from table in House |
2018-02-20 | House | House conferees Garofalo, Baker, and Poppe. |
2018-02-20 | House | New conference committee of 3 requested |
2018-02-20 | House | Motion prevailed |
2018-02-20 | House | Motion to take from table |
2017-04-27 | House | Senate conferees Miller, Rosen, Sparks |
2017-04-27 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed |
2017-04-24 | House | House conferees Garofalo, Baker, and Poppe. |
2017-04-24 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2017-04-24 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate conferees Miller; Rosen; Sparks |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed |
2017-04-24 | Senate | House conferees Garofalo; Baker; Poppe |
2017-04-24 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 35-31 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF580 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF580, now on General Orders |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-03-02 | House | Bill was passed vote: 76-53 |
2017-03-02 | House | Third reading |
2017-03-01 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 2, 2017 |
2017-02-27 | House | Second reading |
2017-02-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2017-02-23 | House | Author added Backer. |
2017-02-15 | House | Author added Lohmer. |
2017-02-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2017-02-06 | House | Author added Haley. |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
2017-02-02 | House | Authors added Hertaus, Dettmer, Erickson, McDonald, and Jurgens. |
2017-02-01 | House | Authors added Runbeck and Uglem. |
2017-02-01 | House | Author stricken Rosenthal. |
2017-01-30 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF580 (Similar To) 2017-03-07 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF600