MN SF580 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-07 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF600
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-07 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF600
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform State Labor Standards Act
Title
Uniform State Labor Standards Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jeremy Miller [R] | Sen. Paul Gazelka [R] | Sen. Julie Rosen [R] | Sen. Karin Housley [R] |
Sen. Michelle Benson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF600 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Comm report: Adopt previous comm report |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Rule 21, referred to Rules and Administration |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Local Government |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF600 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Senate conferees Miller, Rosen, Sparks