MN HF572 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Health plan loss ration requirements established, and nonprofit health maintenance organizations net earnings use requirements established.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health plan loss ration requirements established, and nonprofit health maintenance organizations net earnings use requirements established.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-18HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-13HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy
2019-02-14HouseAuthor added Mann
2019-02-11HouseAuthor added Kunesh-Podein
2019-02-07HouseAuthors added Cantrell and Bierman
2019-01-31HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Commerce

Same As/Similar To

SF1985 (Similar To) 2019-03-18 - Author added Abeler

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback