MN HF530 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Author added Poston
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Domestic abuse prevention program for veterans and their families funding provided, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic abuse prevention program for veterans and their families funding provided, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseAuthor added Poston
2019-03-07HouseAuthors added Ecklund and Persell
2019-02-14HouseReferred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
2019-02-14HouseAuthor added Dettmer and Brand
2019-02-12HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-01-31HouseReferred by Chair to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Division
2019-01-31HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF1118 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback