MN HF4717 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-20 - Author added Niska
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-20 - Author added Niska
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Virtual currency terms defined, and additional disclosure requirements added for virtual currency transactions.
Title
Virtual currency terms defined, and additional disclosure requirements added for virtual currency transactions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Author added Niska |
2024-03-18 | House | Second reading |
2024-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2024-03-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4909 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Authors added Seeberger; Hauschild