MN HF4491 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-14 - Author added Knoblach
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Legislature per diem payments precluded.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislature per diem payments precluded.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-14HouseAuthor added Knoblach
2018-05-09HouseAuthor added Loeffler.
2018-05-08HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance

Same As/Similar To

SF4054 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Author added Klein

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback