MN SF4054 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-07 - Author added Klein
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-07 - Author added Klein
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Per diem payment to the legislature preclusion
Title
Per diem payment to the legislature preclusion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Senate | Author added Klein |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Author added Jensen |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4491 (Similar To) 2018-05-14 - Author added Knoblach