MN HF4449 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Author added Kotyza-Witthuhn
Pending: House Higher Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Author added Kotyza-Witthuhn
Pending: House Higher Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Free college grant program created to cover full cost of state college tuition and fees, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Free college grant program created to cover full cost of state college tuition and fees, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | House | Author added Kotyza-Witthuhn |
2022-03-24 | House | Author added Hanson, J. |
2022-03-23 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2022-03-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy |