MN HF4394 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-17 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-17 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Annuity suitability regulation modified.
Title
Annuity suitability regulation modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2022-05-17 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2022-05-16 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF4108 |
2022-04-07 | House | Second reading |
2022-04-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2022-03-28 | House | Author added O'Driscoll |
2022-03-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4108 (Similar To) 2022-05-22 - Secretary of State, Filed