MN HF4345 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Self-insurance pool additional investment authority provided.
Title
Self-insurance pool additional investment authority provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Second reading |
2022-04-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2022-03-25 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to State Government Finance and Elections |
2022-03-21 | House | Author added Freiberg |
2022-03-17 | House | Referred by Chair to Local Government Division |
2022-03-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF4214 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections