MN HF4306 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - Author added Long
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - Author added Long
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Individual and small group health plan offerings required to include a predeductible, flat co-pay on prescription drug option.
Title
Individual and small group health plan offerings required to include a predeductible, flat co-pay on prescription drug option.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Bierman [D] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] | Rep. Shelly Christensen [D] | Rep. Hunter Cantrell [D] |
Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Jamie Long [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | House | Author added Long |
2020-03-12 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2020-03-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF4315 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Author added Sparks