MN HF43 | 2020 | 91st Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-19 - Authors added Bernardy; Fischer; Xiong, J.
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-19 - Authors added Bernardy; Fischer; Xiong, J.
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Peace officer duty established to intercede when another peace office is using unreasonable force, peace officer duty to report excessive force incidents established, and law enforcement agencies adoption of policies that require peace officer intercede when unreasonable force is being used required.
Title
Peace officer duty established to intercede when another peace office is using unreasonable force, peace officer duty to report excessive force incidents established, and law enforcement agencies adoption of policies that require peace officer intercede when unreasonable force is being used required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-19 | House | Authors added Bernardy; Fischer; Xiong, J. |
2020-06-18 | House | Author added Moller |
2020-06-15 | House | Authors added Davnie, Hausman, Moran, Lee, Jordan, Gomez, Hornstein, Noor, Vang, Kunesh-Podein , and Long |
2020-06-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF94 (Similar To) 2020-06-15 - Referred to Rules and Administration