MN HF4267 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-03 - Author added Barr, R.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-03 - Author added Barr, R.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small business investment credit extended for one year.
Title
Small business investment credit extended for one year.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Author added Barr, R. |
2018-04-30 | House | Author added Anselmo. |
2018-03-29 | House | Author added Davids. |
2018-03-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF3866 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy