MN HF4226 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Author added Her
Pending: House Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Author added Her
Pending: House Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Renter's credit income cap increased, co-pays reduced, and maximum refunds increased.
Title
Renter's credit income cap increased, co-pays reduced, and maximum refunds increased.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | Author added Her |
2022-03-21 | House | Author added Vang |
2022-03-17 | House | Author added Bahner |
2022-03-14 | House | Authors added Youakim, Frazier, Fischer, Feist, and Carlson |
2022-03-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Property Tax Division |
2022-03-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |