MN HF4206 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-17 - Third reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-17 - Third reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
2020 Workers' Compensation Advisory Council recommendations adopted.
Title
2020 Workers' Compensation Advisory Council recommendations adopted.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-17 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-05-17 | Senate | Special Order |
2020-05-16 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-05-16 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF4130 |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF4130, now on General Orders |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2020-05-15 | House | Bill was passed |
2020-05-15 | House | Third reading |
2020-05-13 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 15, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-07 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-05-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-05-04 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-05-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-03-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Labor |
2020-03-05 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF4130 (Similar To) 2020-05-16 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF4206