MN HF4175 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Workforce development scholarships program eligibility expanded.
Title
Workforce development scholarships program eligibility expanded.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Pelowski [D] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Patty Acomb [D] | Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] |
Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Rep. Joe McDonald [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | Second reading |
2024-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2024-03-07 | House | Author added McDonald |
2024-02-26 | House | Author added Long |
2024-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4226 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Author added Duckworth