MN HF4156 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Author added Franson
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Author added Franson
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Teachers Retirement Association and St. Paul Teachers Retirement Fund Association; the rule of 90 reinstated.
Title
Teachers Retirement Association and St. Paul Teachers Retirement Fund Association; the rule of 90 reinstated.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] | Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. Patricia Mueller [R] |
Rep. Paul Torkelson [R] | Rep. John Petersburg [R] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] |
Rep. Matt Bliss [R] | Rep. Jim Nash [R] | Rep. Ron Kresha [R] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] |
Rep. Mary Franson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Author added Franson |
2022-03-14 | House | Author added Theis |
2022-03-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF3931 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Author added Abeler