MN HF4088 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Author added Wiens
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Author added Wiens
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
General education revenue modified to include safe schools aid for charter schools.
Title
General education revenue modified to include safe schools aid for charter schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Clardy [D] | Rep. Elliott Engen [R] | Rep. Natalie Zeleznikar [R] | Rep. Andrew Myers [R] |
Rep. Kristin Robbins [R] | Rep. Josiah Hill [D] | Rep. Mark Wiens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Author added Wiens |
2024-04-11 | House | Author added Hill |
2024-03-18 | House | Author added Robbins |
2024-03-04 | House | Authors added Zeleznikar and Myers |
2024-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF4997 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Author added Maye Quade