MN HF403 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy
Pending: Senate Civil Law and Data Practices Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy
Pending: Senate Civil Law and Data Practices Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Employers prohibited from inquiring about past pay.
Title
Employers prohibited from inquiring about past pay.
Sponsors
Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] | Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Kelly Moller [D] |
Rep. Sandra Feist [D] | Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] | Rep. Emma Greenman [D] | Rep. Kaela Berg [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - House - House: Passage (Y: 80 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 61 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-25 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 61 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-03-25 | House | Bill was passed |
2021-03-25 | House | Third reading |
2021-03-25 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken |
2021-03-25 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken |
2021-03-25 | House | Amendments offered |
2021-03-23 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 25, 2021 |
2021-02-18 | House | Authors added Greenman and Berg |
2021-02-18 | House | Second reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2021-02-15 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2021-02-04 | House | Authors added Moller and Feist |
2021-02-04 | House | Author changed Bahner as second author |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
2021-02-01 | House | Authors added Edelson and Bahner |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
Same As/Similar To
SF171 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - Author added Hawj