MN SF171 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Author added Hawj
Pending: Senate Civil Law and Data Practices Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Job applicant previous wage history inquiry by prospective employer prohibition

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Job applicant previous wage history inquiry by prospective employer prohibition

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25SenateAuthor added Hawj
2021-02-22SenateAuthor added Dziedzic
2021-01-21SenateAuthors added Latz; Pappas
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy
2021-01-19SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF403 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback