MN HF4007 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Author added Klevorn
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Author added Klevorn
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Combined net receipts tax modified.
Title
Combined net receipts tax modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] | Rep. Dave Lislegard [D] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] |
Rep. Ginny Klevorn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | Author added Klevorn |
2022-03-24 | House | Author added Lillie |
2022-03-17 | House | Author added Boe |
2022-03-10 | House | Author added Lislegard |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF4522 (Similar To) 2022-04-21 - Referred to Taxes