MN HF400 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Senate conferees Rosen; Draheim; Eaton
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Opioid Addiction Advisory Council, opioid stewardship fund, and opiate product registration fee established; opioid addiction prevention, education, intervention, treatment, and recovery provisions modified; reports required; and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Opioid Addiction Advisory Council, opioid stewardship fund, and opiate product registration fee established; opioid addiction prevention, education, intervention, treatment, and recovery provisions modified; reports required; and money appropriated.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-18 - House - House: (Y: 75 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House: Passage (Y: 94 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 51 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-18 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 53 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-18 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 53 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-18 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 51 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-18 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 49 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-18 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 125 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 52 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - House: Re-Referral (Y: 53 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateSenate conferees Rosen; Draheim; Eaton
2019-04-04HouseSenate conferees Rosen, Draheim, Eaton
2019-04-04HouseSenate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed
2019-04-03SenateSenate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed
2019-04-03SenateHouse conferees Olson; Halverson; Baker
2019-04-03SenateHouse not concur, conference committee of 3 requested
2019-04-01HouseHouse conferees Olson, Halverson, Baker
2019-04-01HouseHouse refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested
2019-04-01HouseReturned from Senate with amendment
2019-04-01SenateThird reading Passed
2019-04-01SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2019-03-26SenateSecond reading
2019-03-26SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Finance
2019-03-20SenateIntroduction and first reading
2019-03-20SenateReceived from House
2019-03-18HouseBill was passed as amended
2019-03-18HouseThird reading as amended
2019-03-18HousePoint of order raised, ruled well taken
2019-03-18HousePoint of order raised, ruled well taken
2019-03-18HouseAmended
2019-03-14HouseMotion did not prevail
2019-03-14HouseMotion to re-refer Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
2019-03-14HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, March 18, 2019
2019-03-07HouseMotion did not prevail
2019-03-07HouseMotion to re-refer State Government Finance Division
2019-03-07HouseSecond reading
2019-03-07HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2019-02-28HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-02-21HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-02-19HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-02-14HouseReferred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-02-07HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations
2019-01-31HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce
2019-01-28HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF751 (Similar To) 2019-03-26 - HF substituted in committee HF400

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF0400&ssn=0&y=2019
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF400&version=0&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF400&version=1&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF400&version=2&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF400&version=3&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF400&version=4&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF400&version=5&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0400&session_number=0&year=2019&id=65
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0400&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10072
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0400&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10073
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0400&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10075
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0400&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10076
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0400&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10077
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0400&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10078
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0400&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10079
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0400&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10080
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0400&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10074
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls91&number=1526

Bill Comments

feedback