MN SF751 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - HF substituted in committee HF400
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Opiate epidemic response; registration fee; response advisory council; response account; appropriation; provisions modifications; valid photographic identification (photo ID) requirement for purchase; reporting

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Opiate epidemic response; registration fee; response advisory council; response account; appropriation; provisions modifications; valid photographic identification (photo ID) requirement for purchase; reporting

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26SenateHF substituted in committee HF400
2019-03-25SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
2019-03-20SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Rules and Administration
2019-03-04SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
2019-02-21SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy
2019-02-18SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
2019-02-14SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
2019-01-31SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF400 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Third reading

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback