MN HF3988 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Author added Petersburg
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Author added Petersburg
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Peacetime emergency order and rule procedures and requirements modified.
Title
Peacetime emergency order and rule procedures and requirements modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Peggy Scott [R] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] | Rep. Matt Bliss [R] |
Rep. Brian Johnson [R] | Rep. Jim Nash [R] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Joshua Heintzeman [R] |
Rep. John Petersburg [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Author added Petersburg |
2022-04-04 | House | Author added Heintzeman |
2022-03-31 | House | Authors added Urdahl, Bliss, Johnson, Nash, and Theis |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
Same As/Similar To
SF3512 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections