MN HF3959 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Author added Franke
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Author added Franke
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Disabled veteran tax exclusion amounts modified.
Title
Disabled veteran tax exclusion amounts modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Bliss [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Keith Franke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Author added Franke |
2022-03-10 | House | Author added Poston |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF3767 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Referred to Taxes