MN HF3841 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Author added Akland
Pending: House Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Author added Akland
Pending: House Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Natural immunity exemption provided in lieu of employer vaccination or testing requirements.
Title
Natural immunity exemption provided in lieu of employer vaccination or testing requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Boe [R] | Rep. Donald Raleigh [R] | Rep. Brian Pfarr [R] | Rep. Peggy Scott [R] |
Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Susan Akland [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Author added Akland |
2022-03-07 | House | Author added Theis |
2022-03-03 | House | Author added Scott |
2022-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |