MN HF3812 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Child welfare provisions modified.
Title
Child welfare provisions modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-05 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-05-05 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy |
2020-03-16 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2020-03-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy |
2020-02-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF4106 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy