MN HF3810 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Author added West.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Author added West.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Project Build Minnesota funding provided to encourage students to consider a career in the construction industry, and money appropriated.
Title
Project Build Minnesota funding provided to encourage students to consider a career in the construction industry, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Regina Barr [R] | Rep. Pat Garofalo [R] | Rep. Roz Peterson [R] | Rep. Jim Nash [R] |
Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] | Rep. Sandy Layman [R] |
Rep. Nolan West [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Author added West. |
2018-03-28 | House | Author added Layman. |
2018-03-22 | House | Author added Lucero. |
2018-03-19 | House | Authors added Theis and Bennett. |
2018-03-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF3430 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy