MN HF3724 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Social media algorithms that target children prohibited.
Title
Social media algorithms that target children prohibited.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Second reading |
2022-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2022-03-17 | House | Authors added Elkins, Kotyza-Witthuhn, and Edelson |
2022-03-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2022-03-14 | House | Author added Stephenson |
2022-03-03 | House | Author added Koznick |
2022-02-28 | House | Authors added Lucero, Scott, Bennett, and Erickson |
2022-02-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3933 (Similar To) 2022-03-30 - Second reading