MN HF3613 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Author added Bernardy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Author added Bernardy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Shelter-linked mental health grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Shelter-linked mental health grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Liz Olson [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] | Rep. Heather Keeler [D] |
Rep. Kelly Moller [D] | Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2022-03-30 | House | Author added Moller |
2022-03-18 | House | Division action, return to Human Services Finance and Policy |
2022-03-17 | House | Authors added Hornstein and Keeler |
2022-03-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Preventing Homelessness Division |
2022-03-03 | House | Author added Olson, L. (as chief) |
2022-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3249 (Similar To) 2022-04-26 - Second reading