MN HF3442 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-01 - House: Referred by Chair to Health Care and Human Services Finance Division
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-01 - House: Referred by Chair to Health Care and Human Services Finance Division
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
License and registration fees increased for home care providers, nursing assistant registration fee created, housing with services establishments and personal care assistants modified, rate reduction provided for customized living services, phase-in for nursing facility rate rebasing changed, and nursing facility rate provisions changed.
Title
License and registration fees increased for home care providers, nursing assistant registration fee created, housing with services establishments and personal care assistants modified, rate reduction provided for customized living services, phase-in for nursing facility rate rebasing changed, and nursing facility rate provisions changed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-01 | House: Referred by Chair to Health Care and Human Services Finance Division | |
2010-03-24 | House: Division action, to pass as amended and return to Finance | |
2010-03-15 | House: Committee report, without further rec to amend, re-refer to Finance | |
2010-03-15 | House: Referred by Chair to Health Care and Human Services Finance Division | |
2010-03-08 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Care and Human Services Policy and Oversight |