MN HF3432 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - Author added Stephenson
Pending: House Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - Author added Stephenson
Pending: House Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senior claimant and claimants with a disability exemption amount expanded.
Title
Senior claimant and claimants with a disability exemption amount expanded.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] | Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] | Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] | Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] |
Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | House | Author added Stephenson |
2022-03-17 | House | Author added Bahner |
2022-02-21 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Property Tax Division |
2022-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF3183 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Referred to Taxes