MN HF3397 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Human Services Finance
Pending: House Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Human Services Finance
Pending: House Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Peer recovery support services and recovery peer requirements modified, and tiered reimbursement rate structure for recovery peers development required.
Title
Peer recovery support services and recovery peer requirements modified, and tiered reimbursement rate structure for recovery peers development required.
Sponsors
Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Brion Curran [D] | Rep. Luke Frederick [D] |
Rep. Jeff Backer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Human Services Finance |
2024-03-07 | House | Authors added Frederick and Backer |
2024-02-13 | House | Authors added Baker and Curran |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3379 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Referred to Human Services