MN HF3397 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Motion prevailed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Motion prevailed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Real property ownership definitions clarified, and record owner required to be listed as a grantee in tax-forfeited land sales.
Title
Real property ownership definitions clarified, and record owner required to be listed as a grantee in tax-forfeited land sales.
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Laurie Halverson [D] | Rep. Kelly Moller [D] |
Rep. Tim O'Driscoll [R] | Rep. Ruth Richardson [D] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Motion prevailed |
2020-03-16 | House | Motion to re-refer Property and Local Tax Division |
2020-03-12 | House | Second reading |
2020-03-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-03-02 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2020-02-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF3390 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy