MN HF3341 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-12 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-12 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appraisal management company licensure modified.
Title
Appraisal management company licensure modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2020-05-12 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2020-05-11 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF3435 |
2020-05-09 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-05-04 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-05-04 | House | Committee report, re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-05-04 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-05-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-03-04 | House | Motion prevailed |
2020-03-04 | House | Motion to re-refer Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2020-03-02 | House | Second reading |
2020-03-02 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2020-02-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF3435 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Secretary of State, Filed