MN HF3291 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Authors added Liebling; Johnson, C.; Lee; Hausman
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Authors added Liebling; Johnson, C.; Lee; Hausman
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Statewide cessation services to help Minnesotans quit using tobacco products authorized, tobacco cessation account in the special revenue fund established, and money transferred to tobacco cessation account.
Title
Statewide cessation services to help Minnesotans quit using tobacco products authorized, tobacco cessation account in the special revenue fund established, and money transferred to tobacco cessation account.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Authors added Liebling; Johnson, C.; Lee; Hausman |
2018-03-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2018-03-22 | House | Authors added Ecklund and Hansen. |
2018-03-21 | House | Author added Slocum. |
2018-03-14 | House | Author added Dehn, R. |
2018-03-12 | House | Author added Bly. |
2018-03-08 | House | Authors added Considine, Wagenius, and Lillie. |
2018-03-05 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF3006 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Author added Frentz