MN HF3285 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Home park closing provisions modified.
Title
Home park closing provisions modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
2018-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Reform |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF2909 (Similar To) 2018-03-14 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance