MN HF3213 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Motion did not prevail vote: 55-71
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Motion did not prevail vote: 55-71
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Congo; agency procurement of supplies or services from persons that fail to disclose information relating to conflict minerals originating in the Democratic Republic of the Congo or its neighboring countries prohibited, and notices required.
Title
Congo; agency procurement of supplies or services from persons that fail to disclose information relating to conflict minerals originating in the Democratic Republic of the Congo or its neighboring countries prohibited, and notices required.
Sponsors
Rep. Phyllis Kahn [D] | Rep. Lyndon Carlson [D] | Rep. Sheldon Johnson [D] | Rep. Nels Pierson [R] |
Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] | Rep. Karen Clark [D] | Rep. Ron Erhardt [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - House - House: Suspension of Rules (Y: 55 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | Motion did not prevail vote: 55-71 |
2016-04-21 | House | Motion to suspend rules |
2016-04-14 | House | Author added Erhardt. |
2016-04-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance |
2016-03-21 | House | Author added Clark. |
2016-03-17 | House | Author added Hornstein. |
2016-03-16 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3064 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Author added Marty