MN HF3200 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Author added Scott
Pending: House Subcommittee on Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Author added Scott
Pending: House Subcommittee on Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Open Meeting Law; audio recordings of all meetings required.
Title
Open Meeting Law; audio recordings of all meetings required.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Ginny Klevorn [D] | Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] |
Rep. Peggy Scott [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Author added Scott |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred by Chair to Subcommittee on Local Government |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF3026 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Referred to Local Government