MN HF3169 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Secretary of State Chapter 282
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Secretary of State Chapter 282
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Legislative Salary Council established, and constitutional amendment to remove lawmakers' power to set their own pay proposed and modified.
Title
Legislative Salary Council established, and constitutional amendment to remove lawmakers' power to set their own pay proposed and modified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-15 - House - House: Repassage, as amended by the Senate (Y: 68 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - House - House: Metsa Motion to Concur (Y: 68 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - House - House: Passage (Y: 69 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 63 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-15 - House - House: Metsa Motion to Concur (Y: 68 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - House - House: Passage (Y: 69 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 63 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | Secretary of State Chapter 282 | |
2014-05-21 | Governor's action Approval | |
2014-05-16 | Presented to Governor | |
2014-05-15 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 68-62 |
2014-05-15 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2014-05-15 | House | Motion prevailed vote: 68-60 |
2014-05-15 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2014-05-15 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2014-05-15 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Third reading Passed as amended vote: 40-25 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2575 |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2575, now on General Orders |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Received from House |
2014-05-08 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 69-63 |
2014-05-08 | House | Third reading as amended |
2014-05-08 | House | Amended |
2014-05-06 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 8, 2014 |
2014-05-06 | House | Second reading |
2014-05-06 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2014-05-01 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2014-05-01 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2014-04-01 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2014-03-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |