MN HF3101 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Author added Huot
Pending: House Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Author added Huot
Pending: House Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Electric utilities required to include renewable energy program information with bill inserts.
Title
Electric utilities required to include renewable energy program information with bill inserts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Author added Huot |
2020-02-19 | House | Author added Long |
2020-02-13 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Division |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |