MN HF3081 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Social work practice changes to requirements, licensing, and other provisions made; technical, clarifying, and conforming changes made; and definitions amended and provided.
Title
Social work practice changes to requirements, licensing, and other provisions made; technical, clarifying, and conforming changes made; and definitions amended and provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | House | Second reading |
2020-04-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-02-13 | House | Authors added Baker, Albright, and Considine |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3005 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Second reading