MN SF3005 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Social work practice requirements, licensing and regulatory provisions modification
Title
Social work practice requirements, licensing and regulatory provisions modification
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Mathews [R] | Sen. John Marty [D] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] | Sen. Michelle Benson [R] |
Sen. Scott Jensen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Author added Jensen |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3081 (Similar To) 2020-04-14 - Second reading