MN HF3043 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Climate and Energy Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Climate and Energy Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Geothermal energy demonstration project funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Geothermal energy demonstration project funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | Author added Bierman |
2022-02-07 | House | Author added Koegel |
2022-02-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Climate and Energy Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2878 (Similar To) 2022-02-21 - Author added Frentz