MN HF2993 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Authors added Lueck and Marquart
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Authors added Lueck and Marquart
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State Patrol pension cost funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
State Patrol pension cost funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Green [R] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Dale Lueck [R] |
Rep. Paul Marquart [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | Authors added Lueck and Marquart |
2020-02-13 | House | Authors added Theis and Poston |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3714 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy