MN HF2894 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Watershed district borrowing authority increased.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Watershed district borrowing authority increased.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-21 House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes
2010-04-15 House: Division action, to pass as amended and return to Finance
2010-03-22 House: Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Finance
2010-03-22 House: Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
2010-03-17 House: Author added Poppe
2010-03-15 House: Division action, to pass and return to State and Local Government Operations Reform, Technology and Elections
2010-03-11 House: Committee report, to pass and re-refer to State and Local Government Operations Reform, Technology and Elections
2010-03-11 House: Referred by Chair to Local Government Division
2010-03-04 House: Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Environment Policy and Oversight
2010-02-16 House: Author added Lenczewski
2010-02-11 House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Finance
2010-02-11 House: Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback