MN HF2869 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National Guard members provided access to information regarding state-sponsored life insurance program.
Title
National Guard members provided access to information regarding state-sponsored life insurance program.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Howe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2018-05-02 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2018-05-01 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2692 |
2018-03-08 | House | Second reading |
2018-03-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans Affairs Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF2692 (Similar To) 2018-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 136 05/14/18