MN HF2854 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Capital Investment
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Capital Investment
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Board of Water and Soil Resources local road wetland replacement program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Board of Water and Soil Resources local road wetland replacement program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Sundin [D] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. Todd Lippert [D] |
Rep. Kaela Berg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Capital Investment |
2022-02-01 | House | Author added Berg |
2022-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3751 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance