MN SF3751 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Local road wetland replacement program appropriation
Title
Local road wetland replacement program appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Authors added Eichorn; Ruud |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2854 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Capital Investment