MN HF2775 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Towed implements of husbandry brake requirements amended.
Title
Towed implements of husbandry brake requirements amended.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Fabian [R] | Rep. Paul H. Anderson [R] | Rep. Paul Torkelson [R] | Sen. Bernhard Eken [D] |
Rep. John Ward [D] | Rep. Debra Kiel [R] | Sen. Lyle Koenen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2012-03-29 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2012-03-28 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2394 |
2012-03-15 | House | Second reading |
2012-03-15 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2012-03-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Policy and Finance |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF2775&ssn=0&y=2011 |
Text | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bin/getbill.php?number=HF2775&version=0&session=ls87 |